Chaiton, Abraham (CPSO#: 22831)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 405
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: (416) 741-2456
Fax: (416) 741-2454
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abraham Chaiton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chaiton ( CPSO# 22831 )

Business Address:
405 - 2115 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 741-2456

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 07 Mar 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABRAHAM CHAITON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAITON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970