Chakrabarti, Anita (CPSO#: 62408)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
2245 West Broadway Street
Vancouver BC  V6K 2E4
Phone: 1 604 910 5453
Fax: 604 733-5988

Medical Records Location

Address: 200 - 2245 West Broadway Vancouver, BC V6K 2E4
Date Received: 11 May 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018