Chakrabarti, Gobinda Lal (CPSO#: 22663)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012