Chakrabarti, Sumontra (CPSO#: 82663)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor Medical Clinics
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tropical Diseases Unit, 13th Floor
Norman Urqhart Building
200 Elizabeth Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-340-3675
Fax: 416-340-3260
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 521-4196
Fax: (416) 521-4082
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Chakrabarti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chakrabarti ( CPSO# 82663 )

Business Address:
Medical Clinics
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
Medical Health System
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Avenue
13th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUMONTRA CHAKRABARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABARTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009