Chakraborty, Anita Rupali (CPSO#: 81168)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
SHSC Sunnybrook Campus
Room H 351
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7255
Fax: (416) 480-5146
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anita Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chakraborty ( CPSO# 81168 )

Business Address:
SHSC Sunnybrook Campus
Room H351
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA RUPALI CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2007