Chakraborty, Krishna (CPSO#: 94618)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu

Education:University of Calcutta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KM Medical Centre
Unit 18, 811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6X 0T9
Phone: (905) 455-5252
Fax: (905) 455-2727
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sheridan Doctors Clinic
Suite 6, 373 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P8
Canada
Phone: 905-452-8881
Fax: 905-452-9997
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krishna Chakraborty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chakraborty ( CPSO# 94618 )

Business Address:
Suite 18
811 Bovaird Drive West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P8
Phone Number: (905) 452-8881

Business Address:
Suite 6
373 Steels Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y 0P8
Phone Number: (905) 452-8881

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISHNA CHAKRABORTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRABORTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2011