Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chakravarthi, Srinivasa Chari Tatadesika (CPSO#: 43970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Feb 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:Banaras Hindu University, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite M 200
2222, Cherry st
Toledo OH  43608
United States
Phone: 419-251-8019
Fax: 419-251-5819

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan
USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRINIVASA CHARI TATADESIKA CHAKRAVARTHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRAVARTHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1988