Chakravarti, Neetu (CPSO#: 92227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:American University of the Caribbean, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Renew Medical Clinic
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone: (905) 271-1134
Fax: (905) 271-1136
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PeelMed
475 Charlois Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Canada
Phone: (905) 454-3347
Fax: (905) 454-3288
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Unit 201
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2H 2V5
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-9411
Fax: (519) 749-9455
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neetu Chakravarti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chakravarti ( CPSO# 92227 )

Business Address:
Renew Medical Clinic
1015 Cawthra Road
Mississauga ON  L5G 4K3
Phone Number: (905) 271-1134

Business Address:
Peel Med Clinic
475 Charolais Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6Y 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 454-3347

Business Address:
Suite 201
310 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2H 2V5
Phone Number: (519) 749-9411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Wisconsin

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEETU CHAKRAVARTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAKRAVARTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 4, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of January 27, 2017: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)