Chalklin, Lori Whittington (CPSO#: 55848)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Caroline Medical Group
3305 Harvester Road
Units 15-20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone: (905) 632-8007
Fax: (905) 681-6341
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lori Chalklin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )

Business Address:
3305 Harvester Road
Units 15 - 20
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007


Corporation Name: Chalklin Duncan Gallaccio Pintea Wallik Walsh Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Walsh ( CPSO# 90905 )
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 73981 )
Dr. D. Wallik ( CPSO# 53982 )
Dr. D. Pintea ( CPSO# 78124 )
Dr. G. Duncan ( CPSO# 66390 )
Dr. L. Chalklin ( CPSO# 55848 )
Dr. A. Gallaccio ( CPSO# 82590 )

Business Address:
Units 15 - 20
3305 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3N2
Phone Number: (905) 632-8007

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI WHITTINGTON CHALKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHALKLIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1988