Chalvardjian, Norma Elizabeth Irene (CPSO#: 22814)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 22 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1997