Chalvardjian, Peter Gregory (CPSO#: 62449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Common Medical Centre
Unit 3
South Common Mall
2110 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5L 5Z5
Phone: (905) 820-3209
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 420
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 625-1619
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER GREGORY CHALVARDJIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHALVARDJIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Nov 1992 to 02 May 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1991