Chamberlain, Jean Earla (CPSO#: 64018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Obstetrics And Gynaecology
2Nd Floor Fontbonne
301 James St S
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6041
Fax: (905) 383-3336
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Chamberlain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chamberlain ( CPSO# 64018 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
Obstetrics and Gynaecology
301 James Street South
2nd Floor
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 521-6041

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN EARLA CHAMBERLAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMBERLAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992