Chamberlain, Michael John (CPSO#: 41754)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Mar 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2006