Chambers, Rosemary Jane (CPSO#: 26324)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 1996