Chamia, Nabil Jean (CPSO#: 23433)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 05 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1971
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Apr 2016