Chammas, Salim Bahige (CPSO#: 60249)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Liege, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 2011