Champagne, Allyson Hope (CPSO#: 70027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J3
Phone: (613) 257-2311 Ext. 3
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

68 Bridge St.
Carleton Place ON  K7C 2V3
Canada
Phone: 613 492 3222
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MN Charles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 12 2008


Corporation Name: MN Charles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Charles ( CPSO# 69313 )
Dr. A. Champagne ( CPSO# 70027 )

Business Address:
106 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 722-3987

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLYSON HOPE CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005