Champagne, Caro Line (CPSO#: 61574)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 749-6495
Fax: (519) 749-6997
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Champagne ( CPSO# 61574 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6495

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARO LINE CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991