Chan, Aaron Yan-Lok (CPSO#: 68017)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Pelham Road
Suite 118
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone: (905) 688-9670
Fax: (905) 688-6979
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aaron Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 68017 )

Business Address:
118 - 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 688-9670

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON YAN-LOK CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1996