Chan, Alex Dart Ming (CPSO#: 62410)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 1999