Chan, An-Wen (CPSO#: 79536)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:University of Calgary, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
Skin Surgery Centre
5th floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone: 4163237732
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
Ambulatory Transplant Centre
Peter Munk Building, 12th floor
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 4113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: An-Wen Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 79536 )

Business Address:
Suite 842, 5th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-7732

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AN-WEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009