Chan, Andrew Shun Hung (CPSO#: 64421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hong Kong Sanatorium and
Hospital
2 Village Road
Happy Valley 0000
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852-2572-0211

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW SHUN HUNG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Jan 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1994