Chan, Andrew York (CPSO#: 70352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

162 Cumberland Street
Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-0113
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1333 Sheppard Ave. East
Suite 345
North York ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Y. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 70352 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
General Division
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
225 - 162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-0113

Business Address:
345 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW YORK CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001