Chan, Angelina Ghit Jong (CPSO#: 77912)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Windsor Womens Health
Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone: (519) 253-6033
Fax: (519) 253-6866
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Angelina G.J. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 77912 )

Business Address:
South Windsor Womens Health
Suite 201
3850 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9G 1X2
Phone Number: (519) 253-6033

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELINA GHIT JONG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007