Chan, Anthony Kam Chuen (CPSO#: 64523)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
Room 3N27-E
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 73464
Fax: (905) 577-8478
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony K. C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 64523 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
Department of Pediatrics
Room 3N27-E
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY KAM CHUEN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1994