Chan, Anthony Kwok-Hing (CPSO#: 58058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
145 Queenston Street
Suite 305
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 685-5506
Fax: (905) 685-8558
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chan ( CPSO# 58058 )

Business Address:
145 Queenston Street
Suite 305
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 685-5506

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY KWOK-HING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1988