Chan, Bernard Wan-Bun (CPSO#: 23953)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of London, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2000