Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chan, Bok Man (CPSO#: 63056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of London, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000 Ext. 5071
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bok Man Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chan ( CPSO# 63056 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5071

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Jul 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOK MAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1994