Chan, Charles Kai Nam (CPSO#: 33571)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: Chan, Kai Nam (used until: 10 Sep 1996 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9N945
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3235
Fax: (416) 971-6427
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Agincourt Pulmonary Services
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 208
Scarborough ON  M1V 4P2
Canada
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 402
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 975-1613
Fax: (416) 975-2522
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES KAI NAM CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982