Chan, Chris Ching Wai (CPSO#: 96478)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Windsor University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 416-494-2120
Fax: 416-747-3611
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

100 Colborne St. West
Suite 306
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Canada
Phone: 705-327-6652
Fax: 705-327-6693
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Tri-Hospital Sleep Laboratory West
3024 Hurontario Street
Suite 208
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Canada
Phone: 905-566-1010
Fax: 905-566-0440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chris Ching Wai Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 96478 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (905) 325-2201

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
100 Colborne Street West
Suite 306
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone Number: (705) 327-6693

Business Address:
Tri-Hospital Sleep Laboratory West
Suite 208
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 566-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRIS CHING WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 25 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Jul 2013
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2013