Chan, Christopher Ting Man (CPSO#: 69079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
8N-846
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3073
Fax: (416) 340-4951
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tse-Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tse ( CPSO# 69258 )
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 69079 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
8N-842
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3073

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER TING MAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1999