Chan, Cindy De Jing (CPSO#: 103010)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Village Shopping Centre
2877 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Phone: (416) 223-4141
Fax: (416) 491-6428
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 103010)

Business Address:
6 - 2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Phone Number: (647) 340-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CINDY DE JING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2016