Chan, Clara Carwei (CPSO#: 82644)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 601
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 960-5007
Fax: (416) 960-0333
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Health Centre
Eye Clinic
8th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Canada
Phone: (416) 867-7422
Fax: (416) 867-3688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto Western Hospital
6th Floor East Wing, Reception 1
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2D8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-5401
Fax: (416) 603-1993
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

TLC Laser Eye Centers
Yonge Eglinton Office
2345 Yonge St. Suite 212
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Canada
Phone: (416) 733-2020
Fax: (416) 733-0316
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Eye Institute
340 College Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: (416) 928-5075
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Clara C. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chan ( CPSO# 82644 )

Business Address:
Suite 601
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 960-5007

Business Address:
St. Michael's Health Centre Eye Clinic
61 Queen Street East
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7422

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
East Wing
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5401

Business Address:
TLC Laser Center Yonge Eglington
2345 Yonge Street
Suite 212
Toronto ON  M4P 2E5
Phone Number: (416) 545-1900

Business Address:
Kensington Eye Institute
6th Floor
340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARA CARWEI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011