Chan, David Kwok Wai (CPSO#: 72609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Suite 923
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5474
Fax: (416) 864-5473
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chan ( CPSO# 72609 )

Business Address:
Suite 923
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone Number: (416) 864-5474

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KWOK WAI CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005