Chan, Edward Se-Ming (CPSO#: 76263)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: Chan, Edward See-Ming (used until: 16 Oct 2003 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Se-Ming Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 76263 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD SE-MING CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003