Chan, Edward (CPSO#: 64970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 740-1625
Fax: (519) 740-0115
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 650-2777
Fax: (519) 650-5577
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Chan Flamand Kolyn Lee Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nguyen ( CPSO# 79450 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 77748 )
Dr. D. Kolyn ( CPSO# 59578 )
Dr. F. Flamand ( CPSO# 62734 )
Dr. E. Chan ( CPSO# 64970 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
50 Sportsworld Crossing Road
Kitchener ON  N2P 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 650-2777

Business Address:
Suite 201
745 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 0B6

Business Address:
Suite 2B
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993