Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Chan, Edwin Sai Lum (CPSO#: 65753)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dundee, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Queensway W
Suite 111
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Phone: (905) 897-9228
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWIN SAI LUM CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 06 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1996