Chan, Erin Teresa Whin Yee (CPSO#: 93767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
1920 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1H 2V6
Phone: (647) 350-0550
Fax: (647) 350-0552
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN TERESA WHIN YEE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012