Chan, Frank Shiu Man (CPSO#: 43243)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2221 Keele Street
Suite 303
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone: (416) 241-4010
Fax: (416) 241-1579
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

104 - 1017 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3K 1Z1
Canada
Phone: (416) 630-9329
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank S. M. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Chan ( CPSO# 43243 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
2221 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M6M 3Z5
Phone Number: (416) 241-4010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANK SHIU MAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1986