Chan, Gabriel Fai Pond (CPSO#: 63033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin, Swatow

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
60 Scottfield Drive
Scarborough ON  M1S 5T7
Phone: (416) 940-4818
Fax: (416) 292-1709
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

unit 4 C
4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6050 Ext. 8093
Fax: (416) 756-3144
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabriel F.P. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan ( CPSO# 63033 )

Business Address:
60 Scottfield Drive
Scarborough ON  M1S 5T7
Phone Number: (416) 940-4818

Business Address:
4C - 4773 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL FAI POND CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1995