Chan, Gabriel Wai Lang (CPSO#: 83032)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206-A
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 878-5200
Fax: (705) 878-5229
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gabriel W.L. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan ( CPSO# 83032 )

Business Address:
Suite 206-2
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON  K9V 5G6
Phone Number: (705) 878-5200

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 14 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GABRIEL WAI LANG CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009