Chan, Gerald Chee Bunn (CPSO#: 69859)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4190 Finch Avenue East
Suite 306
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 299-3502
Fax: (416) 299-3797
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerald Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan ( CPSO# 69859 )

Business Address:
306 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 299-3502

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 20 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD CHEE BUNN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 May 1996