Chan, Gladys Ka Yan (CPSO#: 80667)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 243
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-7351
Fax: (416) 494-7446
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gladys Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Chan ( CPSO# 80667 )

Business Address:
Suite 243
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-7351

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLADYS KA YAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010