Chan, Grace Shirley (CPSO#: 79521)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sandy Hill Community Health Centre
221 Nelson Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 1C7
Phone: (613) 789-8458
Fax: (613) 789-8710
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Feb 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRACE SHIRLEY CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2006