Chan, Henry Siu Him (CPSO#: 108571)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Mar 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Auckland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2016 to 23 May 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 10 Mar 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Mar 2017