Chan, Henry (CPSO#: 96972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto ON  M3B 1T1
Phone: (416) 495-9902
Fax: (416) 445-9692
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chan ( CPSO# 96972 )

Business Address:
Unit 5
34 Kern Road
Toronto ON  M3B 1T1
Phone Number: (416) 495-9902

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2012