Chan, Herman (CPSO#: 69078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4864
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 College Street Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Herman Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chan ( CPSO# 69078 )

Business Address:
Department of Anesthesia
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M3-200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERMAN CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2001