Chan, Joan Mackenzie (CPSO#: 95084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 837-2283
Fax: (519) 767-2262
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan M. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chan ( CPSO# 95084 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
55 Whyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 837-2283

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOAN MACKENZIE CHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013