Chan, John Yiu Chow (CPSO#: 33716)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 05 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6 Cedarbank Crescent Don Mills, ON M3B 3A4
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2014