Chan, Katherine Yuetha (CPSO#: 32513)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 205, 27 Roncesvalles Avenue, Toronto, ON, M6R 3B2
Date Received: 24 May 2016


Address: Unit 205 27 Roncesvalles Avenue Toronto, ON M6R 3B2 Tel: 416 532 2894
Instructions: Please contact Dr. Edmund Chen for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 15 Dec 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016